+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 82 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- 5:09 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCURRENCE MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THIRD TIME HCS SB 344(JUD) AM H
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 344(JUD) AM H
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 1NR
- DP: HOLM, GRUENBERG, OGG, MCGUIRE;
- NR: GARA
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 344
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 344
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/24 CALENDAR
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT; NR: FRENCH,
- OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, SEEKINS; NR: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD