+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/31 CHAPTER 93 SLA 00
- 8:20 AM 5/12/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 5DP 2NR
- DP: BUNDE, PHILLIPS, GRUSSENDORF,
- FOSTER, DAVIS; NR: WILLIAMS, AUSTERMAN
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (DEC, DCED) 4/14/00
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/19/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 34(FIN)
- PASSED Y27 N1 A12
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 18, 2000 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAVIS
On April 14, 2000 in the House:
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (DEC, DCED)
- BRICE, HALCRO
- DP: ROKEBERG, SANDERS; NR: HARRIS,
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 3NR
On April 6, 2000 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On April 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N1 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/00
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 34(FIN)
- PASSED Y15 N4 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTES (DEC, DCED)
On March 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- WILKEN
- DNP: GREEN; NR: PARNELL, PETE KELLY,
- DP: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS, LEMAN;
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 3NR NEW TITLE
On April 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DEC)
- DP: MACKIE, HOFFMAN, LEMAN; NR: DONLEY
- L&C RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor