+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On August 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/3/02
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/5 CHAPTER 131 SLA 02
On June 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- 11:38AM 6/19/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 15, 2002 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 339
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 14, 2002 in the House:
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 339
On May 13, 2002 in the House:
- AM: DAVIES
- FIN RPT 6DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: BUNDE, WHITAKER, HARRIS, LANCASTER,
- MULDER, WILLIAMS; NR: MOSES, HUDSON;
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 6, 2002 in the House:
- JUD RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: MEYER, ROKEBERG; NR: BERKOWITZ,
- COGHILL, KOOKESH
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
On April 1, 2002 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 339
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y16 N4
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 339
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y17 N2 A1
- ELTON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- HOFFMAN, LEMAN
- DP: DONLEY, WARD; NR: GREEN, AUSTERMAN,
- FIN RPT 2DP 4NR
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor