+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (62)
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 36 SLA 04
- 11:12 AM 6/3/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RESCIND PASSING UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- VERSION: CSSB 337(L&C)
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- PASSED Y40
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
- RECEDED FROM (H) AM Y38 E1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- AM NO 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y38 N1 A1
- SENATE MESSAGE: FAILED TO CONCUR
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y8 N12
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 337(FIN) AM H
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- ENGROSSED
- PASSED Y38 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 337(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2004
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- DP: HAWKER, WILLIAMS; NR: MEYER,
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 2DP 4NR
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 38
- STOLTZE, CHENAULT, HARRIS
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- CRA REFERRAL WAIVED
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 337(L&C)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- STEVENS B NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 337(L&C)
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2004
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/23 CALENDAR
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, HOFFMAN,
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 7DP
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, STEVENS G;
- L&C RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: DAVIS, FRENCH
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor