+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:04 A.M. 6/22/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/7 CHAPTER 31 SLA 22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N1 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 33(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 N2 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL, TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 33(FIN)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/29 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, MCCARTY
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 7DP 1NR
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, WOOL, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK
- NR: JOSEPHSON
- FN2: (REV)
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MERRICK
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 33(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 33(FIN)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF
- NR: WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
- FN2: (REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING NEXT CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, BISHOP, OLSON, REVAK, MICCICHE
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 3DP 4NR SAME TITLE
- NR: REVAK, KAWASAKI, MICCICHE, BISHOP
- DP: STEVENS, VON IMHOF, KIEHL
- FN1: (REV)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
- COSPONSOR(S): KIEHL
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor