+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 81 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/04
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 5:09 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCURRENCE MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N1 E2 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSSB 327(STA) AM H
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- FAILED PASSAGE Y17 N12 E1 A10
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 327(STA)
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2004
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- STA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: HOLM, WEYHRAUCH; NR: SEATON,
- COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLM
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: KOOKESH, KAPSNER, KOHRING
- DP: MASEK, OGG, STEPOVICH, HOLM;
- TRA RPT 4DP 3NR
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
- TRA, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, GREEN, STEVENS B,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 327(STA)
- FRENCH, DYSON, ELTON
- PASSED Y17 N1 E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 327(STA)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: HOFFMAN
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN;
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor