+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/02
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 74 SLA 02
On June 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- 2:48 PM 6/14/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 16, 2002 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 324(L&C)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On May 15, 2002 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 14, 2002 in the House:
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 324(L&C)
On May 13, 2002 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/02
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- MORGAN, MCGUIRE, BERKOWITZ
- DP: PORTER, KOHRING, KOTT; NR: JOULE,
- RLS RPT 3DP 4NR
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR
On May 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N1 A1
- VERSION: CSSB 324(L&C)
On May 12, 2002 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RLS
On May 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y17 N1 A2
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/11/02
On April 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 324(L&C)
On April 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
On March 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: DONLEY, THERRIAULT
- DP: TAYLOR, COWDERY;
- JUD RPT 2DP 2NR
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: STEVENS, TORGERSON, LEMAN, DAVIS
- L&C RPT CS 4NR SAME TITLE
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor