+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (67)
On July 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/11/98
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/10 CHAPTER 81 SLA 98
On May 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- 9:55 AM 5/27/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): DUNCAN
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 9, 1998 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N25 A3
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/98
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 323(FIN)
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RYAN, CROFT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y38 A2
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- INDETERMINATE SENATE FN (ADM) 3/12/98
- FISCAL NOTE (COR)
- DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, MARTIN, KOHRING,
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 6DP
On April 30, 1998 in the House:
- DP: PORTER, GREEN, JAMES, BUNDE;
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR 1AM
- INDETERMINATE SENATE FN (ADM) 3/12/98
- NR: ROKEBERG AM: BERKOWITZ
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (COR) 3/12/98
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, KELLY, DONLEY,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 323(FIN)
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- MILLER, GREEN
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- KELLY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 3/30 CALENDAR
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: PEARCE, SHARP, PHILLIPS, TORGERSON
- NR: DONLEY, ADAMS
- PREVIOUS FN (CORR)
- PREVIOUS INDETERMINATE FN (ADM)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: TAYLOR
- INDETERMINATE FN TO SB (ADM)
- FISCAL NOTE TO SB (COR)
- NR: ELLIS, PARNELL
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER, PEARCE
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor