+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- 8:31 AM 5/18/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/24 CHAPTER 54 SLA 94
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/22/94
On May 7, 1994 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 6, 1994 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 5, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 321(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 N- A1
- BROWN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): NORDLUND
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- JUD RPT 6DP
- DP: GREEN, KOTT, JAMES, PORTER
- DP: PHILLIPS, DAVIDSON
- -PREVIOUS SENATE ZERO FN (CORR) 3/21/94
- -2 PREVIOUS SENATE ZERO FNS (DPS) 3/7/94
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
- JUD REFERRAL ADDED
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
On March 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4CAL 1NR 3/22/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, TAYLOR, PEARCE,
- DONLEY, LEMAN, LITTLE, MILLER, SHARP
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 321(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE PUBLISHED (CORR)
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS APPLY (DPS-2)
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
- ZERO FNS TO SB & CS PUBLISHED (DPS-2)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD, FIN
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor