+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/23/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 40 SLA 06
On May 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- 3:12 PM 5/17/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 315(L&C)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 315(L&C)
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/5 - ON 5/6 CALENDAR
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2006
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: KERTTULA, HAWKER, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH, MOSES
- DP: KELLY, CHENAULT;
- FIN RPT 2DP 5NR
On April 29, 2006 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSSB 315(L&C)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 315(L&C)
- PASSED Y17 N1 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, BUNDE, DYSON
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 2NR
On April 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: DAVIS
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, STEVENS B
- L&C RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor