+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On July 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 58 SLA 06
On June 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 3:17 PM 6/6/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS SB 310(FIN) AM H
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 310(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 A1
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/4 CALENDAR
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2006
On April 28, 2006 in the House:
- DP: WEYHRAUCH, FOSTER, MEYER;
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 3DP 6NR
- NR: HAWKER, HOLM, JOULE, KERTTULA, STOLTZE, CHENAULT
- FN2: (COR)
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- FN2: (COR)
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- NR: CRAWFORD, LYNN, GUTTENBERG, LEDOUX, KOTT, ROKEBERG
- DP: ANDERSON;
- L&C RPT HCS(STA) 1DP 6NR
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- FN2: (COR)
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- DP: GARDNER, LYNN, GATTO, GRUENBERG, RAMRAS, SEATON
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 6DP
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- STA, L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 310
- VERSION: SB 310
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/31 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2006
On March 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN2: (COR)
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- NR: HOFFMAN
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, DYSON, STEDMAN
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
On March 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor