+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- 1:33 PM 6/3/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 45 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/2/04
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 31(RES) AM
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 31(RES) AM
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- TRA RPT 3DP 4NR
- DP: STEPOVICH, KOHRING, HOLM;
- NR: KAPSNER, KOOKESH, MASEK, OGG
- FN2: ZERO(DOT)
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 31(RES) AM
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 31(RES)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y13 N6 E1
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN SECOND READING
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/26 CALENDAR
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 3DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, STEVENS B;
- NR: GREEN, HOFFMAN; DNP: BUNDE;
- AM: OLSON
- FN2: ZERO(DOT)
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
On April 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 4DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- NR: OGAN, ELTON, LINCOLN;
- DP: SEEKINS, STEVENS B, WAGONER, DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT CS 2DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: COWDERY, THERRIAULT;
- NR: OLSON, WAGONER; AM: LINCOLN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, RES, FIN
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor