+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 3, 1998 in the House:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COR) 3/4/98
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 3/19/98
- RYAN, HODGINS
- DP: JAMES, BERKOWITZ; NR: ELTON, IVAN,
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 2DP 4NR
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): DONLEY, HALFORD, GREEN
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 309
- MACKIE, LEMAN, PEARCE, TAYLOR
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- ADAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (COR)
- JUD RPT 1DP 1NR 1AM
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN (ADM)
- DP: TAYLOR; NR: PARNELL; AM: ELLIS
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COR)
- DP: GREEN, MACKIE, WARD; NR: DUNCAN
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)