+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (54)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- 4:57 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 142 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/28/04
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCURRENCE MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 309(JUD)
- PASSED Y37 A3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 309(JUD)
On April 26, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 1NR
- DP: SAMUELS, GRUENBERG, OGG, MCGUIRE;
- NR: GARA
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 2NR
- DP: SEATON, LYNN, HOLM; NR: COGHILL,
- WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLM
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING ON RECON
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- E1
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 309(JUD) AM
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 309(JUD)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN 3RD READING
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- WAGONER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, OGAN, THERRIAULT
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD