+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM SENATE
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 308(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- ADOPTED JUDICIARY LETTER OF INTENT
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- STEDMAN, ELLIS
- COSPONSOR(S): WAGONER, DAVIS, ELTON,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 308(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 7DP
- JUD LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, HOFFMAN,
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN2: ZERO(CRT)
- FN3: (ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On April 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD LETTER OF INTENT RECEIVED
- JUD CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS FORTHCOMING 4DP 1NR
- LETTER OF INTENT FC WITH JUD REPORT
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, ELLIS, OGAN;
- NR: THERRIAULT
- FN1: (ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(CRT)
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
- FN2: ZERO(CRT)
- FN1: (ADM)
- DP: STEVENS G, STEDMAN, GUESS
- STA RPT 3DP
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS