+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/9/98
- 5/8/98 CHAPTER 30, SLA 98
On May 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR VETO OVERRIDDEN Y42 N18
- 1:25 PM 5/8/98 RETURNED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 5/7/98
On April 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- 10:40 AM 4/20/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y28 N12
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 307(RLS)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 FLD Y12 N26 A2
- AM NO 2 FLD Y8 N32
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BARNES
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 3/3/98
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 3/23/98
- NR: ELTON
- DP: PORTER, WILLIAMS, PHILLIPS, KOTT;
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) 4DP 1NR
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- DP: JAMES, BERKOWITZ, IVAN, DYSON;
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 4DP 1NR
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 3/3/98
- NR: ELTON
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y15 N5
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 307
- COSPONSOR: KELLY
- PASSED Y19 N1
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER; NR: PARNELL
- JUD RPT 2DP 1NR
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor