+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- COSPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 306(JUD) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/98
On April 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- DP: SHARP, PEARCE, DONLEY; NR: PHILLIPS,
- FIN RPT 3DP 3NR (JUD)CS
- PREVIOUS FN (REV)
- ADAMS, TORGERSON
- REFERRED TO RLS
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
- PREVIOUS FN APPLIES (REV)
- NR: TAYLOR, PARNELL, ELLIS
- JUD RPT CS 3NR NEW TITLE
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- DP: WILKEN, LEMAN, WARD; NR: GREEN
- HES RPT 3DP 1NR
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- HES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)