+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/2/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 42 SLA 04
- 1:33 PM 6/3/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCURRENCE MESSAGE READ AND HELD
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS SB 305(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y34 E1 A5
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 305(FIN)
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2004
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE, CHENAULT, HARRIS
- DP: HAWKER, MOSES, FATE, FOSTER, JOULE,
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 6DP 3NR
- FN1: (DNR)
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: (DNR)
- DAHLSTROM, MASEK; NR: GATTO, KERTTULA
- DP: LYNN, STEPOVICH, WOLF, HEINZE,
- RES RPT 6DP 2NR
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- VERSION: SB 305
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N5 E3
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- GUESS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y13 N5 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 305
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- WAGONER
- COWDERY, BUNDE, WILKEN, GREEN, SEEKINS,
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, OGAN, STEDMAN,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/3 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: GREEN, DYSON, BUNDE; NR: HOFFMAN,
- FIN RPT 3DP 3NR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/2004
- OLSON, STEVENS B
- FN1: (DNR)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DNR)
- NR: STEVENS B, ELTON
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, WAGONER, DYSON;
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor