+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 64 SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 4/30/99
On May 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- 11:30 AM 5/18/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 304(RLS)
- PASSED Y36 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BRICE
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- JUD RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: CROFT, PORTER, GREEN, JAMES, BUNDE,
- BERKOWITZ; NR: ROKEBERG
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOT) 3/20/98
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- TRA RPT 7DP
- DP: HUDSON, ELTON, KOOKESH, SANDERS,
- COWDERY, MASEK, WILLIAMS
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOT) 3/20/98
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRANSPORTATION, JUDICIARY
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- RLS TO CALENDAR CS NEW TITLE 4/6/98
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN APPLIES (DOT)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 304(RLS)
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, TAYLOR, DUNCAN
- KELLY, PEARCE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 1DP 3NR (TRA)CS
- DP: TAYLOR; NR: PARNELL, MILLER, PEARCE
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DOT)
On March 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT CS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: WARD; NR: WILKEN, HALFORD, GREEN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE TO SB & CS (DOT)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRA, JUD