+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/09
- 8:25 AM 6/30/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 58 SLA 09
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
- VERSION: SB 3
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y39 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2009
On April 10, 2009 in the House:
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, AUSTERMAN, CRAWFORD, KELLY, JOULE, FAIRCLOUGH
- FIN RPT 7DP 2NR
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: HARRIS, HERRON
- DP: CISSNA, GARDNER, KELLER, MUNOZ
- CRA RPT 4DP 2NR
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- FSH RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: KELLER, BUCH, MUNOZ, EDGMON
- NR: JOHNSON, MILLETT
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- FSH, CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y16 N- E3 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- OLSON CHANGED NR TO DP ON 2/6 CRA REPORT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2009
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, STEDMAN, FRENCH
- RES RPT 5DP
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: OLSON, KOOKESH
- DP: FRENCH, THOMAS, MENARD
- CRA RPT 3DP 2NR
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- CRA, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor