+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/29 CHAPTER 16 SLA 94
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 4/30/94
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- 10:52 AM 4/20/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 N1 E2
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- NAVARRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y32 N3 E1 A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 294
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/94
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- DP: OLBERG, SANDERS, DAVIES, WILLIS
- CRA RPT 6DP
- DP: WILLIAMS, BUNDE
- -PREVIOUS SEN ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV)2/24
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUSSENDORF
- COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- RULES RPT 4CAL 1NR 3/16/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 294
- PASSED Y15 N3 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (REV)
- FIN RPT 6DP
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE PUBLISHED (REV)
- CRA RPT 1DP 2NR
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor