+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/4 CHAPTER 27 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/5/04
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- 9:21 AM 4/20/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 289
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 289
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, STOLTZE, GATTO
On April 7, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT 4DP 4NR
- DP: MEYER, CROFT, FOSTER, WILLIAMS;
- NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE, JOULE, MOSES
- FN2: (EED)
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- EDU RPT 6DP
- DP: SEATON, WILSON, GARA, WOLF, OGG,
- GATTO
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDU, FIN
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 289
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/01/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 289
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, BUNDE, COWDERY,
- OGAN, SEEKINS
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 3DP 3NR
- DP: GREEN, HOFFMAN, STEVENS B;
- NR: WILKEN, OLSON, BUNDE
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 3DP
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, WILKEN
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN