+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 5, 1996 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES, FINANCE
On May 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y11 N8 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- HELD TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- JOURNAL CORRECTION TO PAGE 3825
- FNS TO FIN CS (F&G-2)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 285(FIN) AM
- MOTION TO RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 4
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y11 N8 E1
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- AM NO 2 MOVED AND WITHDRAWN
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 MOVED
- QUESTION DIVIDED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 PART A ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- MOTION TO HOLD TO 5/3 FAILED Y10 N10
- AM NO 1 PART B FAILED Y10 N10
- AM TO REVISED AM NO 2 OFFERED & W/D
- REVISED AM NO 2 MOVED BY HALFORD
- REVISED AMENDMENT NO 2 AS AMENDED
- AM TO REVISED AM NO 2 OFFERED BY LEMAN
- AM TO REVISED AM NO 2 AS AM ADP UN CON
- REVISED AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED Y13 N7
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y19 N1
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y9 N11
- THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR
- AM TO REVISED AM NO 2 ADPT UNAN CON
On May 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 1DNP SAME TITLE
- COSPONSOR(S): DONLEY
- FN TO CS (F&G)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (REV)
On April 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- FISCAL NOTE (F&G)
- RES RPT 3DP 3AM
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)