+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
On April 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y13 N7
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 280(FIN) AM
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y13 N6 E1
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y14 N6
- AM NO 2 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y6 N14
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N8
- THIRD READING 4/12 CALENDAR
On April 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1DNP NEW TITLE
- PREVIOUS FNS(GOV, DCRA-3, DOE, LAW, DNR)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (ADM, DPS, DOT)
On March 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED Y12 N8
On March 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT CS 3DP 1DNP SAME TITLE
- FISCAL NOTES TO SB & CS (GOV, DCRA-3,
- DOE, LAW, DNR)
- ZERO FNS TO SB & CS (ADM, DPS, DOT)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
- COSPONSOR: HALFORD
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): DONLEY
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CRA, STA