+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On November 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/17/17
- SIGNED INTO LAW 11/16 CHAPTER 26 SLA 17
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1:40 PM 11/13/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 28
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 28
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2017
On May 13, 2017 in the House:
- DP: ORTIZ, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 4DP 7NR
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: KAWASAKI, NEUMAN, GUTTENBERG, PRUITT, GRENN, TILTON, WILSON
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KITO
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2017
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: GIESSEL, HUGHES, COGHILL, STEDMAN
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 28
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: SB 28
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- RES REFERRAL ADDED AFTER CRA
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: MACKINNON
- DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, STEDMAN
- CRA RPT 3DP 1NR
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor