+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 9, 1998 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- SENATE INDETERMINATE FN (ADM) 2/19/98
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (COR) 4/22/98
- TITLE CHANGE AUTHORIZED BY HCR 37
- DP: PORTER, GREEN; NR: BUNDE, JAMES
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) NT 2DP 2NR
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y13 N3 E3 A1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N12 E3 A1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 274(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y17 N1 E1 A1
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 4/23 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y14 N5 E1
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/98
- FN TO CS (COR)
On April 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 1NR 1DNP NEW TITLE
- PREVIOUS INDETERMINATE FN APPLIES (ADM)
- DP: SHARP, PEARCE, PHILLIPS, DONLEY
- NR: PARNELL; DNP: ADAMS
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- INDETERMINATE FN TO SB & CS (ADM)
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER, PEARCE; NR: ELLIS
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor