+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/04
- 4:56 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 134 SLA 04
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 274
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2004
- PASSED Y32 E1 A7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 274
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- JOULE
- FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE,
- DP: HAWKER, MEYER, CROFT, MOSES, FATE,
- FIN RPT 8DP 2NR
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- WILSON
- DP: SEATON, CISSNA, COGHILL, WOLF,
- HES RPT 5DP
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 274
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 274
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2004
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 5DP 2NR
- STEVENS B; NR: OLSON, BUNDE
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, HOFFMAN,
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, WILKEN; NR: GUESS
- HES RPT 3DP 1NR
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor