+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/5/10
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/7 CHAPTER 50 SLA 10
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:15 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 272
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 272
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: BUCH, HOLMES
- DP: LYNN, T.WILSON, OLSON
- L&C RPT 3DP 2NR
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- TRA RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: T.WILSON, PETERSEN
- NR: MUNOZ
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- AM: GRUENBERG
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- TRA, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 272
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 272
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, BUNDE, DAVIS
- L&C RPT 5DP
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: MENARD, MEYER, PASKVAN, DAVIS
- TRA RPT 4DP
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- TRA, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor