+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 272(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 272(FIN)
On May 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2006
- FIN CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
On April 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: BUNDE
- NR: WILKEN, GREEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FIN RPT CS FORTHCOMING 4NR 1DP
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- AM: DAVIS
- NR: ELLIS
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, STEVENS B
- L&C RPT CS 3DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor