+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/22 CHAPTER 10 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/20/04
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- 9:27 AM 3/4/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N- E4
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y24 N8 E4 A4
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 270 AM H
- PASSED Y33 E4 A3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SB 270 AM H
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: GRUENBERG, SEATON, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SAMUELS
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 270
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, COWDERY,
- STEVENS B, OGAN, FRENCH, DYSON,
- STEVENS G, WAGONER, SEEKINS, ELTON,
- THERRIAULT
- PASSED Y13 E6 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 270
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: STEVENS G, GUESS; NR: STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On January 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor