+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/20/10
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/1 CHAPTER 35 SLA 10
- 2:15 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 270
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y36 A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 270
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2010
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: STOLTZE
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, N.FOSTER, SALMON
- FIN RPT 7DP 1NR
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: SB 270
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2010
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 270
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor