+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/28 CHAPTER 49 SLA 98
On May 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- 8:35 AM 5/6/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On May 2, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG PASSED Y35 N2 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- KELLY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y31 N4 A5
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LABOR) 3/4/98
- WILLIAMS, ELTON, NICHOLIA
- DP: KOTT, PHILLIPS; NR: PORTER,
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) 2DP 4NR
On March 26, 1998 in the House:
- L&C RPT 3DP 3NR
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LABOR) 3/4/98
- DP: KUBINA, HUDSON, ROKEBERG;
- NR: COWDERY, SANDERS, RYAN
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 269(L&C)
- PASSED Y15 N- E4 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE TO SB & CS (LABOR)
- DP:LEMAN, KELLY, MILLER, HOFFMAN, MACKIE
- L&C RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor