+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 46 SLA 02
- 1:25 PM 5/30/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 13, 2002 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 10DP 1NR
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT, DAVIES,
- MOSES, LANCASTER, HUDSON, FOSTER,
- MULDER, WILLIAMS; NR: BUNDE
- FN1: (MVA)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(CED)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 267(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 267(FIN)
On May 12, 2002 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 267(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 267(FIN)
On May 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(CED)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN1: (MVA)
- HOFFMAN, OLSON, WILKEN, LEMAN, WARD
- DP: DONLEY, KELLY, GREEN, AUSTERMAN,
- FIN RPT CS 9DP NEW TITLE
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP
- DP: STEVENS, LEMAN, DAVIS
- FN1: (MVA)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(CED)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(CED)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN1: (MVA)
- DAVIS, HALFORD
- DP: THERRIAULT, PHILLIPS, STEVENS,
- STA RPT 5DP
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(CED)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN1: (MVA)
- STA, L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor