+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/18 CHAPTER 26 SLA 02
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/16/02
On May 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- 3:18 PM 5/3/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 29, 2002 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 266(RES)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 266(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, JAMES
On April 26, 2002 in the House:
- FIN RPT 9DP
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT, DAVIES,
- MOSES, LANCASTER, HUDSON, FOSTER,
- WILLIAMS
- FN1: (CED)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 266(RES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 266(RES)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: KELLY, GREEN, AUSTERMAN,
- WARD; NR: DONLEY
- FN1: (CED)
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 7DP SAME TITLE
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, HALFORD,
- STEVENS, WILKEN, LINCOLN, ELTON
- FN1: (CED)
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: STEVENS, AUSTERMAN, DAVIS,
- TORGERSON
- FN1: (CED)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEMAN
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, TAYLOR
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, RES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor