+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/29 CHAPTER 16 SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 4/30/98
On April 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- 8:15 AM 4/21/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 261(FIN)
- PASSED Y35 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- OGAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BERKOWITZ, JOULE
- ROKEBERG, MULDER, KUBINA
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 4NR 1AM
- DP: MULDER, MARTIN, DAVIES, FOSTER;
- NR: THERRIAULT, GRUSSENDORF,
- DAVIS, KELLY; AM: KOHRING
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 2/6/98
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER, KOTT
On March 19, 1998 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N1 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): MACKIE, KELLY
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 261(FIN)
- PASSED Y16 N2 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HALFORD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: TORGERSON, DONLEY
- NR: SHARP, PHILLIPS, PARNELL
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DCED)
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: MILLER, WARD, MACKIE, GREEN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor