+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 11:50 AM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 65 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 26(STA)
- PASSED Y32 E4 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 E4 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 26(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, OGG
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: SEATON, DAHLSTROM, CRAWFORD;
- NR: WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM/ALL DEPTS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, DAHLSTROM
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 26(STA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, STEVENS B, GUESS,
- COWDERY, DYSON, STEVENS G, WAGONER,
- SEEKINS, OLSON, THERRIAULT
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 26(STA)
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(STA) 7DP
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN,
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM/ALL DEPTS)
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, HOFFMAN,
- DYSON, GUESS
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM/ALL DEPTS)
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/17/03
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor