+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/23/00
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 65 SLA 00
On May 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- 2:50 PM 5/5/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 24, 2000 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 21, 2000 in the House:
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y36 A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 259(JUD)
On April 20, 2000 in the House:
- WILLIAMS, FOSTER; NR: DAVIES
- FIN RPT HCS(JUD) 8DP 1NR
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, BUNDE,
- AUSTERMAN, GRUSSENDORF, DAVIS,
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (ADM, LAW) 4/19/00
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (S.FIN/DPS) 4/13/00
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/21 CALENDAR
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- DP: ROKEBERG; NR: CROFT, MURKOWSKI,
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 1DP 6NR
- GREEN, KOTT, JAMES, KERTTULA
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (S.FIN/DPS) 4/13/00
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (ADM, LAW)
On April 15, 2000 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 259(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 4/14/00
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, PHILLIPS,
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 6DP 2NR
- PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- GREEN, PETE KELLY, LEMAN;
- NR: ADAMS, WILKEN
- FISCAL NOTE (S.FIN/DPS)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (ADM)
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE TO SB (COR)
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE TO SB (ADM)
- HALFORD
- DP: TAYLOR; NR: TORGERSON, ELLIS,
- JUD RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor