+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- 9:50 A.M. 7/1/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 7/24 CH 16 SLA 24
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/25/24
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 256
- PASSED Y39 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 256
On May 14, 2024 in the House:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/14/2024
- HELD TO 5/15 CALENDAR
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: C.JOHNSON, STORY, WRIGHT, SHAW
- NR: CARPENTER
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
On March 27, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On March 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 256
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 256
On March 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2024
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CAL
On March 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 3DP
- DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, BJORKMAN
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
+ − Sponsor
SENATE STATE AFFAIRS BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor