+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/10/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/12 CHAPTER 180 SLA 04
- 2:46 PM 7/26/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 254(FIN)(EFD FLD)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y31 N8 E1
- READ THIRD TIME CSSB 254(FIN)(EFD FLD)
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT 2DP 4NR
- DP: ROKEBERG, ANDERSON; NR: CRAWFORD,
- GUTTENBERG, DAHLSTROM, LYNN
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 254(FIN)(EFD FLD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 254(FIN)
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y11 N8 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y12 N8
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/6 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2004
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 4NR NEW TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, STEVENS B;
- NR: GREEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, BUNDE
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN FORTHCOMING
- DNP: FRENCH; AM: SEEKINS
- NR: BUNDE, STEVENS G;
- L&C RPT CS 1DNP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/04
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor