+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/23 CHAPTER 51 SLA 94
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/21/94
On May 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- 1:10 PM 5/8/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On April 28, 1994 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY BROWN
- AMENDMENT NO 1 FAILED Y10 N28 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 252(JUD)
- PASSED Y38 N- A2
- BROWN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PARNELL
On April 22, 1994 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 6DP
- DP: GREEN, KOTT, JAMES, PORTER
- DP: PHILLIPS, NORDLUND
- -5 PREVIOUS SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTES
- ...(DPS, 2-ADM, LAW, CORR) 2/18/94
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS, KOTT
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- RULES RPT 3CAL 1NR 3/10/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 252(JUD)
- COSPONSOR(S): HALFORD
- PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): SALO
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 7DP (JUD)CS SAME TITLE
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS
- (CORR, ADM-2, DPS, LAW)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
- ZERO FNS TO SB & CS PUBLISHED
- (CORR, ADM-2, DPS, LAW)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR
On January 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD, FIN