+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (62)
On October 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 6/6/96
- 3:45 PM 5/20/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- (S) ADOPTED (H) LETTER OF INTENT
On May 2, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N12 A2
- LETTER OF INTENT ADOPTED
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 1, 1996 in the House:
- BUNDE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y27 N11 A2
- READ/THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 250(FIN) AM H
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
On April 30, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM TO AM 1 FAILED Y13 N25 A2
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N25
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y24 N16
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y29 N11
On April 18, 1996 in the House:
- 4 SENATE FNS (UA, DNR, REV, F&G) 2/15/96
- NR: FOSTER, HANLEY
- DNP: NAVARRE, BROWN
- DP: MULDER, MARTIN, KELLY, THERRIAULT
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 2DNP 2NR
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- 4 SEN. FNS (UA, DNR, REV, F&G) 2/15/96
- NR: LONG, KOTT, AUSTERMAN, OGAN, GREEN
- DP: NICHOLIA, DAVIES
- RES RPT HCS(RES) 2DP 5NR
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y11 N9
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y8 N12
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 Y15 N5
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y9 N11
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- AM TO AM 2 FAILED Y10 N10
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
On March 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 250(FIN) AM
- MOTION TO RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2
- HELD TO 3/25 CALENDAR W/MOTION PENDING
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 3/22 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N8
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- IN SECOND READING
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2CAL 1NR 1OTHER 3/20
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO RLS COMMITTEE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES RPT 2CAL 1NR 3/6/96
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTES TO CS (DNR, UA, REV, F&G)
- FIN RPT CS 2DP 4NR SAME TITLE
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)