+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (62)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 8:32 AM 6/5/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 126 SLA 03
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 17
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N1 A2
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 25(RLS)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 25(RLS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- SEATON
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGG, DAHLSTROM, GARA,
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 17
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 6DP
- DP: KERTTULA, KOTT, COGHILL, MORGAN,
- BERKOWITZ, ROKEBERG
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE, MOSES
- CHENAULT, WHITAKER, FOSTER, HARRIS,
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, JOULE, CROFT,
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 17
- FIN RPT HCS(HES) NT 9DP 2NR
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 17
- HES RPT HCS(HES) NT 2DP 4NR
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DP: SEATON, WILSON; NR: CISSNA,
- COGHILL, WOLF, GATTO
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 25(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2003
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- PASSED Y16 N1 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 25(FIN)
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS G, DYSON, SEEKINS
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1DNP 1NR NEW TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN, OLSON,
- STEVENS B; DNP: GREEN; NR: BUNDE
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: GUESS; AM: GREEN
- DP: DYSON, DAVIS, WILKEN;
- HES RPT CS 3DP 1NR 1AM SAME TITLE
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/17/03
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor