+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- FN2: (ADM)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1:40 P.M. 8/10/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 9/2 CH 68 SLA 22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/1/22
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 3NR
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, FOSTER
- NR: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK
- FN2: (ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA HCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 25(STA)
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MCCARTY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 25(STA)
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 7DP
- DP: CLAMAN, STORY, KAUFMAN, EASTMAN, TARR, VANCE, KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN2: (ADM)
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): VANCE
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): EDGMON, TARR
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SNYDER
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, HOPKINS, NELSON
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, SCHRAGE, DRUMMOND, SPOHNHOLZ, TUCK, FIELDS, HANNAN
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 25(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 25(FIN)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/2 CALENDAR
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2022
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI
- FN2: (ADM)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- STA RPT CS 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- NR: SHOWER, HOLLAND, REINBOLD
- DP: COSTELLO, KAWASAKI
- FN1: (ADM)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, HUGHES, KAWASAKI, BEGICH, KIEHL, COSTELLO, WILSON,
- REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, MICCICHE
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor