+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 79 SLA 06
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/17/06
On June 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- 3:17 PM 6/6/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 249(JUD)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 A2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 8, 2006 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 249(JUD)
- PASSED Y35 A5
- LEDOUX NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, GARDNER
On April 28, 2006 in the House:
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: GRUENBERG, KOTT, COGHILL, WILSON, ANDERSON, GARA, MCGUIRE
- CORRECTED JUD RPT 7DP
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: GARA, COGHILL, KOTT, WILSON, ANDERSON, GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT 7DP
On April 24, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, ANDERSON, GARA
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: GARDNER, LYNN, GATTO, ELKINS, SEATON
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 22, 2006 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 249(JUD)
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 249(JUD)
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- FISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, GUESS, THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- JUD RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS