+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (67)
On October 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 8:15 AM 6/14/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/27 CHAPTER 2 FSSLA 96
On June 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y19 N1
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N4
On May 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- MOTION TO CONCUR WITHDRAWN
On May 6, 1996 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y32 N7 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/06/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ/THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 244(FIN) AM H
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y31 N8 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y34 A6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On May 3, 1996 in the House:
- DP: MARTIN, HANLEY, PARNELL, KOHRING
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 7DP 1NR 2AM
- AM: FOSTER, GRUSSENDORF
- DP: NAVARRE, KELLY, THERRIAULT
- NR: BROWN
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 4/11/96
On April 30, 1996 in the House:
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 4/11/96
- NR: G.DAVIS, ROKEBERG, BRICE
- DP: BUNDE, TOOHEY, ROBINSON
- TITLE CHANGE RESOLUTION FORTHCOMING
- HES RPT HCS(HES) NT 3DP 3NR
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 6 UNAN CONSENT
- IN THIRD READING ON RECONSIDERATION
- RTN TO 2ND RESCIND ACTN FLG AM 1 Y16 N4
- RESCINDED ACTN FLG TO ADPT AM 1 Y14 N6
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y13 N7
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 7 ADOPTED Y12 N8
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y10 N10
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 7 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y18 N2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 4/16 CALENDAR
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1DNP 4/12/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PLACED AT BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N10 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y12 N7 E1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- AM NO 5 WAS NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 244(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y11 N8 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y19 N- E1
- PHILLIPS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (DOE)
- FIN RPT CS 1DP 6NR SAME TITLE
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS FN (DOE)
- HES RPT 2NR 1AM
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor