+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- NR: HERRON, GATTO
- DP: LYNN, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- NR: JOHNSON
- DNP: GATTO
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON, PETERSEN, LYNN
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 27
- STA RPT HCS(STA) NT 5DP 1DNP 1NR
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 244
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- OLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 244
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2010
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE
- DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, EGAN
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- DP: MENARD, PASKVAN, MEYER, FRENCH
- STA RPT 4DP
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, THOMAS
On January 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS