+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/20/08
- 3:22 PM 5/1/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 34 SLA 08
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2008
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 243(FIN)
- PASSED Y40
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 243(FIN)
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- DP: HAWKER, CRAWFORD, JOULE, GARA, KELLY, STOLTZE, THOMAS, CHENAULT
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 8DP
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DOLL
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: CSSB 243(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 243(HES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- AM: DYSON
- NR: OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, HUGGINS
- FIN RPT CS(HES) 5DP 1NR 1AM
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- NR: DYSON
- DP: DAVIS, ELTON, THOMAS
- HES RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On January 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor