+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (188)
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/9 CHAPTER 10 SLA 20
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 4:46 P.M. 3/31/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- FN24: (REV)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 205
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- UNIFORM RULE 42 WAIVED UC
- FN17: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN11: ZERO(REV)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(MVA)
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 20
On March 28, 2020 in the House:
- UNIFORM RULE 42(B) WAIVED UC
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- FCC REPORT: FCCS SB 241 RECEIVED 3/28/20 10:55 P.M.
On March 28, 2020 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y35 E4 A1
- FCC RPT ADPTD Y34 N1 E4 A1 FCCS SB 241
- FCC REPORT TAKEN UP
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN20: ZERO(CED)
On March 28, 2020 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTES
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 20
- FCC REPORT READ
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN18: ZERO(CED)
On March 28, 2020 in the House:
- FCC REPORT: FCCS SB 241 RECEIVED 10:59 P.M.
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN21: ZERO(CED)
- FN31: ZERO(CED)
- FN22: ZERO(CED)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- FCC RPT ADPTD Y16 N1 E3 FCCS SB 241
- FN36: ZERO(DHS)
- FN35: ZERO(LAW)
- FN34: ZERO(EED)
- FN33: ZERO(CED)
- FN32: ZERO(ADM)
- FN30: ZERO(DHS)
- FN29: INDETERMINATE(CED)
- FN28: INDETERMINATE(LWF)
- FN27: (REV)
- FN26: ZERO(CED)
- FN25: ZERO(DHS)
- FN24: (REV)
- FN23: ZERO(GOV)
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- UNIFORM RULE 42(A) WAIVED UC
- FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- COGHILL (CHAIR), BISHOP, BEGICH
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y- N17 E2 A1
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- RECEDE MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- RESCIND ACTION (FLD) RECEDE UC
- FAILED RECEDE (H) AM N34 E6
- UNIFORM RULE 42(A) & (B) WAIVED Y33 N1 E6
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- KOPP (CHAIR), SPOHNHOLZ, TALERICO
- FAILED RECEDE (H) AM Y2 N32 E6
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- AM 1 TO AM 2 ADOPTED UC
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 20
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y35 E4 A1
- AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED Y33 N2 E4 A1
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- LIMIT AMS TO AM NO 15
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2020
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED Y33 N3 E4
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 6 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN13: ZERO(DHS)
- FN16: ZERO(GOV)
- FN15: ZERO(CED)
- FN14: ZERO(GOV)
- FN12: ZERO(DHS)
- FN11: ZERO(REV)
- FN10: (REV)
- FN9: ZERO(CED)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(MVA)
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- NR: JOHNSON, PRUITT, STUTES, EDGMON
- DP: THOMPSON, KOPP
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 20
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 2DP 4NR
- AM NO 7 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 8 OFFERED
- AM NO 14 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 8 ADOPTED UC
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 241(RLS) AM H
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 241(RLS) AM H
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- AM NO 15 AS AM ADOPTED Y21 N14 E4 A1
- AM 1 TO AM 15 ADOPTED Y18 N16 E4 A2
- LIMIT DEBATE ON AMS TO 2 MIN EACH - UC
- AM NO 15 OFFERED
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 14 AS AM ADOPTED Y20 N15 E4 A1
- AM 1 TO AM 14 ADOPTED Y31 N4 E4 A1
- PASSED Y34 N1 E4 A1
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM 1 TO AM 11 OFFERED
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 9 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y13 N22 E4 A1
- AM NO 8 AS AM ADOPTED Y33 N1 E4 A2
- AM NO 11 OFFERED
- AM NO 11 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 13 ADOPTED Y33 N2 E4 A1
- AM NO 12 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 12 NOT OFFERED
- AM 2 TO AM 12 ADOPTED Y34 E4 A2
- AM 3 TO AM 12 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 12 AS AM ADOPTED Y34 N1 E4 A1
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RLS
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 241(RLS) AM
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 241
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- RLS CS ADOPTED UC
- RETURN TO SECOND UC
- FN16: ZERO(GOV)
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- FN15: ZERO(CED)
- FN14: ZERO(GOV)
- FN13: ZERO(DHS)
- FN12: ZERO(DHS)
- FN11: ZERO(REV)
- FN10: (REV)
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N11 E2
- AM NO 11 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
- BEGICH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 16 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 17 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 15 ADOPTED Y10 N9 E1
- AM NO 14 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 13 NOT OFFERED
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 12 ADOPTED Y19 N- E1
- AM NO 10 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 9 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
On March 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULES 23 & 24
- RLS RPT CS 4DP 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: COGHILL, GIESSEL, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF
- AM: BEGICH
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- FN2: ZERO(GOV)
- FN7: (REV)
- FN4: ZERO(DHS)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN8: ZERO(CED)
- FN9: ZERO(CED)
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 3/23/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/24 CALENDAR
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(MVA)
On March 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(DHS)
- RLS
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- FN2: ZERO(GOV)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN8: ZERO(CED)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(MVA)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: (REV)
- FN9: ZERO(CED)
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (25)
AM 1 to AM 12
AM NO 12 AS AM ADOPTED Y34 N1 E4 A1
AM 2 to AM 12
AM 2 TO AM 12 ADOPTED Y34 E4 A2
AM 3 to AM 12
AM 3 TO AM 12 ADOPTED UC
AM 1 to AM 15
AM 1 TO AM 15 ADOPTED Y18 N16 E4 A2
AM 1 to AM 14
AM NO 14 AS AM ADOPTED Y20 N15 E4 A1
AM 1 to AM 8
AM 1 TO AM 8 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
AM 1 to AM 11
AM 1 TO AM 11 OFFERED
AM 1 to AM 2
AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED Y33 N2 E4 A1
AM 17
AM NO 17 NOT OFFERED
AM 11
AM NO 11 NOT OFFERED
AM 14
AM NO 14 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
AM 13
AM NO 13 NOT OFFERED
AM 12
AM NO 12 ADOPTED Y19 N- E1
AM 16
AM NO 16 NOT OFFERED
AM 15
AM NO 15 ADOPTED Y10 N9 E1
AM 9
AM NO 9 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
AM 10
AM NO 10 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
AM 3
AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
AM 2
AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
AM 4
AM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N11 E2
AM 5
AM NO 5 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
AM 6
AM NO 6 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
AM 7
AM NO 7 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
AM 8
AM NO 8 FAILED Y6 N12 E2
AM 1
AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor