+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/20/22
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/19 CHAPTER 3 SLA 22
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- 10:40 A.M. 4/19/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- FN2: (DNR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING FIN RPT
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- FIN RPT 9DP
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 240
- PASSED Y31 E9
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 240
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 240
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- VERSION: SB 240
- PASSED Y14 N- E2 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2022
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DNR)
- NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF
- FIN RPT 3DP 3NR
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DNR)
- DP: MICCICHE, KIEHL, BISHOP, STEVENS
- RES RPT 4DP
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- FINDINGS REPORT (PER AS 38.06.050 & AS 38.05.183)
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: (DNR)
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor