+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/31 CHAPTER 1 SLA 21
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 4:35 P.M. 3/26/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 24(L&C)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y32 E8
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 24(L&C)
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK, DRUMMOND
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/19 - ON 3/20 CALENDAR
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2021
- DP: SNYDER, NELSON, MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, KAUFMAN, SPOHNHOLZ
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 6DP
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/19 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y15 N- E5
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 24(L&C)
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEVENS, BISHOP, MICCICHE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 24(L&C)
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/1 CALENDAR
- L&C CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, REVAK, HOLLAND
- L&C RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor